Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Missing Children Day
Sponsored by
Senator Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim May 25 as Missing Children Day.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0539
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Missing Children Day
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Missing Children Day
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Missing Children Day
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed 41
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 43
Text - Third - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Missing Children Day
House 3/12/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 43A
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-409, 7-409 through 7-417 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM