Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act; establishing the purposes of the Act; establishing rights and obligations of specified intended parents who use gamete or embryo donors to conceive a child through collaborative reproduction; establishing specified rights of a child conceived through collaborative reproduction; establishing that a gamete or an embryo donor is not a parent of a child conceived through collaborative reproduction under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1099
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {433527/2 Rejected (12-34)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {143627/1 Rejected (14-33)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {483920/1 Rejected (10-36)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted 49
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 50
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {433527/2 Rejected (12-34) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {143627/1 Rejected (14-33) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {483920/1 Rejected (10-36) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Judiciary 55A
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-901 through 5-914 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM