Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified entities from taking specified actions regarding organ transplantation and anatomical gifts solely on the basis of an individual's disability; prohibiting specified insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from denying coverage for organ transplantations solely on the basis of an insured's or enrollee's disability; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1122
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {337973/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {337973/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 53
House 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1601 through 20-1606 )
(   27-915 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM