Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the days and hours of sale under a Class B wine shop and lounge license in Kent County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Kent County to issue a refillable container permit for draft beer to certain license holders; establishing an application process, hours of sale, and fees for the permit; requiring the Board to adopt certain regulations; authorizing the Board to issue a Class C multiple event beer, wine, and liquor license; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0777
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (129-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Economic Matters 47
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (129-0) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:45 AM