Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education – Private Career Schools, For–Profit Institutions of Higher Education, and For–Profit Online Distance Education Programs – Regulation
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Conway, Kagan, Nathan-Pulliam, Robinson, Young, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 836
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting private career schools, for-profit institutions of higher education, and certain institutions of higher education required to register with the Maryland Higher Education Commission under certain circumstances from enrolling certain students in certain programs under certain circumstances; requiring certain schools or institutions to provide to prospective students certain information before the student signs an enrollment agreement, completes registration, or makes a financial commitment to the school or institution; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1103
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424530/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424530/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {334564/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-14)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 836
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Private Career Schools and For-Profit Institutions of Higher Education - Regulation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {424530/1 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 47
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {424530/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Higher Education – Private Career Schools, For–Profit Institutions of Higher Education, and For–Profit Online Distance Education Programs – Regulation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Appropriations 50
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {334564/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (122-14) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education – Private Career Schools, For–Profit Institutions of Higher Education, and For–Profit Online Distance Education Programs – Regulation
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 836
Text - Chapter - Higher Education – Private Career Schools, For–Profit Institutions of Higher Education, and For–Profit Online Distance Education Programs – Regulation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-320 )
(   11-202.2, 11-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM