Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton and Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, on written request of a landowner in an application to purchase an easement, an easement to authorize the landowner to use the land subject to the easement for renewable energy generation under specified circumstances; requiring, on written request of a landowner, the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation to amend an easement to authorize the landowner to use the land subject to the easement for renewable energy generation under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1091
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-509, 2-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM