Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Astle, Brinkley, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the Governor's Advisory Board on Homelessness and establishing an Interagency Council on Homelessness; establishing the membership, staffing, chair, quorum, and meeting times of the Council; prohibiting a member of the Council from receiving specified compensation but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; establishing specified duties of the Council; requiring the Department of Human Resources to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1036
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {147472/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {854866/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {147472/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/20/2014 3/17/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 53
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {854866/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-417, 6-418 through 6-420, 6-421 through 6-424, 6-422, 6-423, 6-425, 6-426, 6-427 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM