Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities and Maryland Health Care Commission – Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain provision of law requiring the Maryland Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities to collaborate with the Maryland Health Care Commission to publish and provide a certain report card to require the report card to include the racial and ethnic composition of all individuals who hold a certain license or certificate, rather than only physicians; requiring the report card to include a comparison of certain information; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities and Maryland Health Care Commission – Reporting Requirements
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities and Maryland Health Care Commission – Reporting Requirements
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:22 PM
Click to return on the top page