Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh and Muse
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 698
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning in fiscal year 2018 and each fiscal year thereafter, the Governor to include at least $3,000,000 in the annual budget bill for the Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program within the Department of Housing and Community Development.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1476
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {483021/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-39)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 698
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {483021/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 59
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Second Reading Passed 69
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (100-39) 70
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 698
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM