Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Conway, and Garagiola
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each county and the Department of the Environment to adopt a specified solid waste management hierarchy; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that the State undertake specified actions relating to recycling and landfill disposal rates; establishing the Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force; requiring the Task Force to determine the aspirational statewide recycling goal and a recycling and landfill portfolio standard that will reduce the amount of solid waste being sent to landfills; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1266
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, October 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {697579/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Rosapepe) {983927/1 Rejected
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed 32-15)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable with Amendments {697579/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 61
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Rosapepe) {983927/1 Rejected 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed 32-15) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 66
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM