Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points
Sponsored by
Senators Muse, Currie, Smith, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the assessment of points and the penalties associated with the suspension of a driver's license or privilege to drive of an individual who fails to attend a specified driver improvement program or is an obligor 60 days or more out of compliance with the most recent order of the court in making child support payments.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0844
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {838572/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {838572/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 47
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Judiciary 52
House 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Text - Chapter - Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-203, 16-206, 16-303, 16-402, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM