Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Labor - Occupational Licenses - Waiver of Application Fees
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring units of the Maryland Department of Labor to waive certain application fees for certain applicants who hold valid out-of-state licenses in good standing from a state whose licensure requirements exceed or are substantially equivalent to the requirements of this State; authorizing a unit to adopt regulations to carry out certain provisions of this Act; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Department of Labor - Occupational Licenses - Waiver of Application Fees
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 21
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   2.5-101, 2.5-105, 2-111 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:21 PM