Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Phased Retirement for Maryland State Employees
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Phased Retirement for Maryland State Employees; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding a phased retirement option for experienced State employees; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0258
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 9:00 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM