Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Conditions for Relief
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Forehand, and Raskin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the conditions under which relief may be provided to a tenant for specified retaliatory actions taken by a landlord of residential property under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1108
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {878178/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Brinkley) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {878178/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {440216/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (90-46)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {878178/1 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Laid Over (Senator Brinkley) Adopted 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments {878178/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (34-12) 49
House 3/21/2014 3/18/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable with Amendments {440216/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (90-46) 69
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (33-13) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-208.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM