Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Sexual Activity With an Animal, Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices, and Sodomy
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Benson, Eckardt, Feldman, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Kagan, King, Madaleno, Mathias, Muse, Ready, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the offenses of sodomy and unnatural or perverted sexual practices; prohibiting a person from engaging in sexual activity with an animal; prohibiting a person from advertising, soliciting, offering, possessing, selling, transferring, accepting, purchasing, or otherwise obtaining an animal with a certain intent; prohibiting a person from organizing, promoting, conducting, or participating as an observer of a certain event; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1134
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law – Sexual Activity With an Animal, Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices, and Sodomy
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-2102, 3-604, 4-605 )
(   10-606, 10-606.1, 11-203, 2-201, 3-321, 3-322, 3-602, 3-604 )
(   5-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM