Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Carter, Feldman, Guzzone, Hershey, Hester, Hough, Jennings, Klausmeier, Lam, McCray, Nathan-Pulliam, Reilly, Salling, Smith, Washington, West, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the holder of a Class 5 brewery license to brew and bottle malt beverages at a location listed on an individual storage permit; authorizing a local licensing board to conditionally grant an applicant an on-site consumption permit or a Class D beer license that will become effective after the applicant meets certain requirements; authorizing a holder of a micro-brewery license to hold another license; altering the amount of beer that certain manufacturers may sell; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1010
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564638/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {564638/1 Adopted 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 3/28/2019 3/29/2019 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Text - Chapter - Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-207, 2-208, 2-209, 2-210, 2-308, 2-311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM