Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Human Resources - Adoption Awareness Program
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Brochin, DeGrange, Jacobs, Montgomery, and Stone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Resources to collaborate with specified interest groups that specialize in adoption related issues to prepare educational materials about creating an adoption plan for an infant; specifying the contents and formats of the educational materials; requiring the educational materials to be updated periodically and distributed in consultation with specified interest groups; requiring the educational materials to be provided at no cost to specified organizations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-3C-01 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM