Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Nonpreferred Providers - Assignment of Benefits, Reimbursement, and Fraudulent Insurance Acts
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the maximum difference between the coinsurance percentage applicable to specified nonpreferred providers and the coinsurance percentage applicable to specified preferred providers; altering the reimbursement amount payable by specified insurers to specified on-call physicians and hospital-based physicians who are nonpreferred providers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1157
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-201, 14-205, 14-205.2, 27-407.3, 27-408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM