Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Elfreth, Feldman, Hayes, Klausmeier, and Kramer
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain hospitals to provide each patient with written notice that includes certain information related to outpatient facility fees that are charged for services provided at the hospital; requiring the Health Education and Advocacy Unit within the Attorney General's Office, in consultation with the Health Care Services Cost Review Commission, consumers and other stakeholders, to develop a uniform disclosure form and a process for determining and updating the range of fees and fee estimates as required by the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0849
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {927971/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {927971/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Text - Third - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-349.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM