Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Identification, Disclosure, and Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the requirements for renewing a driver's license to include the written disclosure of a specified disorder, disease, or physical disability; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, the Medical and Chirurgical Faculty, and the State Board of Examiners in Optometry to define diseases and physical disabilities that may render an individual unable to exercise reasonable control over a motor vehicle; expanding the scope of health care professionals authorized to make a specified report to the Medical Advisory Board; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1339
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-115, 16-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM