Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Ethics and Procurement Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a system of higher education may, in accordance with specified guidelines, allow educational institutions in the system to enter into lease agreements and receive lease payments from business entities engaged in research and development activity with faculty and staff, as specified; requiring that procedures for research and development by higher educational institutions allow faculty or staff at the institution to have an interest in, be employed by, or have a relationship with entities, as specified; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
(   19-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page