Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Rules of the Road
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Forehand, and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that every person operating a bicycle or a motor scooter in a public bicycle area is subject only to the duties required of the driver of a vehicle under specified rules of the road; requiring that every person operating a bicycle or a motor scooter in a public bicycle area watch for other vehicles in the public bicycle area; and requiring the driver of a vehicle to watch for bicycles on specified highways and bicycle ways.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0052
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1202, 21-1209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM