Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Citizens' United Shareholder Democracy and Protection Act
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Feldman, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Kelley, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Robey, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a Maryland corporation to include in its bylaws specified procedures regarding contributions to campaign finance entities and independent expenditures that the Maryland corporation proposes to make; prohibiting a Maryland corporation from making a contribution to a campaign finance entity or an independent expenditure under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page