Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy Property
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Feldman, King, Lee, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing specified individuals or corporations a credit against the State income tax for a specified percentage of the cost of specified renewable energy property constructed or purchased and placed in service in the State; limiting the amount of the credit for each installation of renewable energy property; limiting the aggregate amount of tax credit certificates that may be issued during a specified period; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1070
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM