Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale - References to Park Heights Redevelopment Area
Sponsored by
Senators Robinson and Oaks
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 755
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating an exception from hours of sale restrictions for certain alcoholic beverages licenses issued for establishments in a certain area in Baltimore City; altering the closing hour of sale for a certain license holder in a certain area of Baltimore City; repealing certain references to the "Park Heights Redevelopment Area"; altering the time during which establishments for which certain alcoholic beverages licenses are issued in a certain area specified in the Park Heights Master Plan may sell alcoholic beverages; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0022
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154132/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {583294/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 755
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale - References to Park Heights Redevelopment Area
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {154132/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale - References to Park Heights Redevelopment Area
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Economic Matters 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments {583294/1 Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale - References to Park Heights Redevelopment Area
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 755
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale - References to Park Heights Redevelopment Area
(   12-102, 12-2003, 12-2004, 12-2005 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page