Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Coaches - Sexual Contact with Minors - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Jones-Rodwell and DeGrange
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a coach from engaging in a sexual act, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a minor under specified circumstances; providing for a statute of limitations for the prosecution of a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0893 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-307, 3-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM