Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the renewable energy portfolio standard in certain years to require a certain percentage of energy from Tier 1 renewable sources each year to be derived from certain geothermal heating and cooling systems; requiring that a certain percentage of energy required to be derived from certain geothermal heating and cooling systems be from systems installed on certain property; clarifying that energy from certain geothermal heating and cooling systems is eligible for inclusion in meeting the renewable energy portfolio standard; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1007
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {527576/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable with Amendments {527576/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 11:30 AM
Click to return on the top page