Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tuition Cap and College Opportunity Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State to provide General Fund support for the University System of Maryland and Morgan State University to achieve 100% of the Maryland Higher Education Commission funding guidelines by 2024; providing for a phase-in of increased General Fund support for the University System of Maryland and Morgan State University; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0675 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-203, 11-105, 11-108, 11-305, 12-117, 15-106.6, 15-106.9, 18-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM