Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, DeGrange, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Peters, and Shank
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the order of priority by which child support income tax refund interception requests are honored; requiring the Child Support Enforcement Administration to provide a specified information sheet to an obligee who receives a specified refund; and requiring the Department of Human Resources to submit a report to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2014, on why specified options for improving child support collection have not been implemented and on the cost of implementing those options.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0550
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-108.8 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM