Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick Leave
Sponsored by
Senators Shank and Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making members of the State Retirement and Pension System eligible to receive creditable service at retirement for the total amount of unused sick leave accrued by the member in specified systems in the State Retirement and Pension System under specified circumstances; providing for the calculation of the creditable service for unused sick leave accrued by a member in specified systems; and requiring the Department of Legislative Services and the State Retirement Agency to provide a specified report on or before December 1, 2013.
Committees
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0718
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {199635/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {314462/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {199635/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Appropriations 51
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {314462/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Passed Enrolled 61A
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM