Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Rental Assistance Programs - Duration of Assistance
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, Kelley, Mathias, Ramirez, and Robinson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that payments to low-income households by the Secretary of Housing and Community Development through the Rental Allowance Program be made for a minimum of 2 consecutive years, subject to redetermination that the household continues to meet eligibility requirements every 6 months; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development, on or before October 1, 2018, and annually thereafter, to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on the implementation of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0689
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {194633/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Department of Housing and Community Development - Rental Assistance Programs - Duration of Assistance
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {194633/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Housing and Community Development - Rental Assistance Programs - Duration of Assistance
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page