Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin and DeGrange
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that the use of compost and compost-based products in State highway construction projects is a best management practice for specified pollution mitigation strategies; requiring the State Highway Administration to establish a specification for the acquisition and use of compost and compost-based products for specified pollution mitigation strategies on or before December 30, 2014; requiring the Administration to update the specification as necessary; requiring the Administration to post the specification on its Web site; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0878
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {399030/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {399030/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-609.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM