Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Supplement
Sponsored by
Senator Salling
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of Baltimore County to grant a certain property tax credit to supplement the State homeowners' property tax credit; providing for the calculation of the credit; prohibiting the county from granting the credit under certain circumstances; providing that the State Department of Assessments and Taxation is responsible for certain administrative duties with respect to the credit; requiring the county to reimburse the Department for the reasonable cost of administering the property tax credit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0583
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Supplement
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-215, 9-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM