Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Civil Action for Embezzlement by Employee
Sponsored by
Senator Shank
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that an employee is civilly liable to an employer if, under specified circumstances, the employee appropriates or secretes money or a thing of value held in an employment capacity; providing for the award of damages, prejudgment interest, and specified costs and fees; establishing that a specified criminal prosecution is not a prerequisite to maintenance of an action under the Act; providing that a criminal prosecution is not precluded by recovery of damages under the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1901 through 3-1907 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM