Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program targeting low-income Maryland high school students to determine if the program can lead to an increase in low-income students attending and succeeding in college; establishing specified eligibility requirements for participation in the Program; requiring the Commission to submit a specified report on the Program to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017, and December 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0779
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464339/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {555165/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Hettleman) {763424/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-3)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {464339/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 53
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {555165/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Hettleman) {763424/1 Adopted 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-3) 63
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1101 through 11-1106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM