Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners - Practice of Chiropractic or Massage Therapy - Penalties and Exemptions
Sponsored by
Senators Forehand, Benson, Montgomery, and Stone
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified persons from knowingly recruiting, persuading, inducing, enticing, or encouraging a person to practice or attempt to practice massage therapy without a license; altering the amount of specified penalties relating to the practice of chiropractic or massage therapy without a license; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1156
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014, October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/19/2014 2/20/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-501, 3-506, 3-5A-01, 3-5A-02 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM