Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Sundays
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Astle, Bates, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Kelley, Norman, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain prohibition against hunting on a Sunday and authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt on a Sunday on private property or on public land designated by the Department; authorizing the Department to allow a person to hunt deer in a county for a half day on certain Sundays; authorizing the Department to allow a person to hunt deer in a county for a full day on certain Sundays in certain deer seasons; and requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations by October 1, 2018.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1338
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Hunting - Sundays
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing canceled
Text - First - Natural Resources - Hunting - Sundays
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM