Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Juvenile Services Program
Sponsored by
Senator Frosh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Community Juvenile Services Program; requiring the Governor to appoint a State Coordinator for Community Juvenile Services; establishing the compensation of the State Coordinator; establishing the Community Juvenile Services Committee; providing for the membership and duties of the Committee; establishing the purpose of the Program; authorizing counties to participate in the Program by developing a specified local plan; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 19
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/05/2013 Text - First - Community Juvenile Services Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-249 through 9-253 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM