Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – Office of the Inspector General – Authority Over Police Department of Baltimore City and Baltimore City Public Schools
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Carter, and McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Charter of Baltimore City to provide that the Baltimore City Office of the Inspector General has the same authority over the Police Department of Baltimore City and Baltimore City Public Schools, including employees of the Police Department or Baltimore City Public Schools, that the Office has over a department of City government or a City employee.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Text - First - Baltimore City – Office of the Inspector General – Authority Over Police Department of Baltimore City and Baltimore City Public Schools
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM