Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Digital Equity for All Maryland Students Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Conway, Feldman, Ferguson, King, Madaleno, and Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring all students to have specified access to digital technology in the classroom on or before the 2016-2017 school year; establishing a Technology Infrastructure Improvement Program to be administered by the Interagency Committee on School Construction; requiring the State to distribute grants from a specified source to county school boards; authorizing the grant amount to be apportioned between specified sources; requiring the Interagency Committee to make specified considerations when allocating a specified grant; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-206.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM