Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno and Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish a specified Prison In-Reach Program; requiring each county board of education to include behavioral health services with school health services; requiring the Alcohol and Drug Abuse Administration to implement a specified program throughout the State to promote early identification of substance abuse; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1245
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-401, 7-415 )
(   10-1204, 10-1205, 10-1404, 10-1501, 10-1601 through 10-1605, 10-207, 10-906, 10-907, 8-1101 )
(   2002, 2005 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM