Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Development - Community Action Agencies - Continuity of Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Community Action Agency Continuity Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development to ensure the continuity of services provided by community action agencies in the State; requiring the Program to provide funding for previously funded community action agencies for use in certain authorized activities; requiring the Secretary of Housing and Community Development to adopt certain regulations; and requiring the Secretary to repeal certain regulations under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0659
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Community Development - Community Action Agencies - Continuity of Funding
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Community Development - Community Action Agencies - Continuity of Funding
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 46 Click to view Recorded Media
(   8-101, 8-108, 8-109, 8-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page