Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Classroom Expenses for Teachers
Sponsored by
Senators Kittleman, Astle, Brochin, Colburn, Edwards, Garagiola, Klausmeier, Raskin, Robey, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual who is a teacher a credit against the State income tax for classroom expenses and supplies; providing that the credit may not exceed the State income tax for the taxable year and that any unused credit may not be carried over to any other taxable year; requiring the Comptroller to adopt regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0513
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-733 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM