Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to designate on a specified formulary the prescription drugs that are Tier I specialty drugs and Tier II specialty drugs; requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to submit a list of specified drugs to the Maryland Insurance Commissioner and to update the list with a specified frequency; requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to allow specified pharmacies and pharmacists to dispense specified specialty drugs if the pharmacist or pharmacy meets specified requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0875
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1632 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM