Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nonpublic Schools – Adequate Health Services – Eligibility for Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher and Hettleman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a nonpublic school that provides adequate health services to certain students through a designated school health services professional is eligible for reimbursement from the county government for up to 50% of the total costs of the provision of adequate health services under certain circumstances; establishing qualifications for certain nonpublic schools to qualify for certain reimbursement; providing that a nonpublic school that does not meet certain qualifications is ineligible for certain reimbursement; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1056
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Nonpublic Schools – Adequate Health Services – Eligibility for Reimbursement
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 4:53 PM
Click to return on the top page