Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation Financing Act
Sponsored by
Senators Miller, Garagiola, Currie, Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Transit Administration to establish no more than two transit benefit districts to impose specified taxes to finance, construct, and operate transit facilities and transit services; authorizing the governing body of a county to impose an additional tax on specified motor fuel; imposing a specified additional tax on motor fuel in each county on or after January 1, 2017; requiring the Comptroller to apply a specified sales and use tax equivalent rate to the motor fuel tax; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, January 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/05/2013 Text - First - Transportation Financing Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 11-221, 2-11A-01 through 2-11A-03, 9-306, 9-401 through 9-406 )
(   9-101 through 9-413 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM