Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secretary of Health - School-Based Health Centers - Guidelines and Administration of Grants
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health, in consultation with the State Department of Education and other stakeholders, to develop certain guidelines for school-based health centers; requiring the Governor to transfer the administration of school-based health center grants from the State Department of Education to the Bureau of Maternal and Child Health within the Maryland Department of Health on or before July 1, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1148
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Ways and Means
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-36)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Secretary of Health - School-Based Health Centers - Guidelines and Administration of Grants
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Secretary of Health - School-Based Health Centers - Guidelines and Administration of Grants
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations Ways and Means 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-36) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:06 AM
Click to return on the top page