Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, Mathias, and Manno
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that a certain test on an elevator unit performed in connection with a certain inspection be performed by a certain licensed elevator mechanic; requiring a third-party qualified elevator inspector to be physically present during a certain test in its entirety to witness that the test has been performed correctly and to verify the proper recording of the result; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to establish an apprenticeship program for third-party qualified elevator inspectors; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1107
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Elevator Inspections - Testing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {207273/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {293327/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Safety - Elevator Inspections - Testing
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {207273/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Floor Amendment {293327/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 62
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-806, 12-809, 12-810, 12-812 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM