Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Care - Dispute Resolution
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a dispute resolution workgroup in the State Department of Education; providing for the membership of the workgroup; requiring the workgroup to make recommendations to the State Superintendent of Schools regarding rules and regulations establishing a specified dispute resolution process; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0932
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {868072/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {868072/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 55A
House 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM