Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on the Long-Term Care Medical Assistance Program Eligibility Determination Process
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Feldman, Klausmeier, Manno, Middleton, Pugh, Kelley, Benson, Reilly, Mathias, Jennings, and Hershey
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on the Long-Term Care Medical Assistance Program Eligibility Determination Process; providing for the composition, chair, duties, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to provide specified data to the Commission on the request of the Commission; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1196
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {997374/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments {997374/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM